EP1016288 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRACKING AN AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC FLAT SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/27] | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTING AN AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC FLAT SCREEN | ||
[2001/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich-Hertz-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Berlin GmbH Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRNER, Reinhard Uhlandstrasse 145 D-10719 Berlin / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Rudolph, Margit, et al Hahn-Meitner-Institut Berlin GmbH, Gemeinsamer Patentservice, Hausvogteiplatz 5-7 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Rudolph, Margit, et al Hahn-Meitner-Institut Berlin GmbH, Gemeinsamer Patentservice, Hausvogteiplatz 5-7 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98949947.0 | 21.08.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998DE02576 | Priority number, date | DE1997137449 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19737449 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911074 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016288 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016288 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
G02B30/26 (EP,US);
H04N13/31 (EP);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/373 (EP);
H04N13/376 (EP);
H04N13/398 (EP);
H04N13/194 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHFÜHREN EINES AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHEN FLACHBILDSCHIRMS | [2000/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRACKING AN AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC FLAT SCREEN | [2001/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ORIENTATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN ECRAN PLAT AUTOSTEREOSCOPIQUE | [2000/27] |
Former [2000/27] | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTING AN AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC FLAT SCREEN | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.01.2002 | GB | 09.01.2002 | NL | 09.01.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | GB | 09.01.2002 | |
NL | 09.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 09.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0702494 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,11,15 * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 40; figures 4,5 * * page 8, line 36 - line 46; figure 7 * * page 8, line 47 - page 10, line 54; figures 8-12 * [A] 3,9,10,12-14; | [A]WO9622660 (REVEO INC [US], et al) [A] 1* page 5, line 14 - line 18; figure 1 * |