EP1019570 - MELAMINE FIBER-CONTAINING FABRICS WITH IMPROVED COMFORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive, New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENT, George, M. 10807 Lederer Avenue Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | 02 /
OTT, Karl Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-68723 Plankstadt / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Werner, Frank BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Werner, Frank BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung ZDX/P-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950045.9 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998EP05917 | Priority number, date | US19970941989 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: US 941989 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9916950 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019570 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019570 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/04 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
D02G3/443 (EP,US);
D02G3/04 (KR);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T442/636 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | MELAMIN-FASER BEINHALTENDE WAREN MIT VERBESSERTEN TRAGEEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2000/29] | English: | MELAMINE FIBER-CONTAINING FABRICS WITH IMPROVED COMFORT | [2000/29] | French: | TISSUS CONTENANT DES FIBRES DE MELAMINE ET OFFRANT UN CONFORT AMELIORE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.11.2001 | GR | 28.11.2001 | LI | 28.11.2001 | DK | 28.02.2002 | PT | 28.02.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/01] | CH | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 28.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5755962 ; | [A]EP0533931 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * page 5, line 25 - line 48; example 1; claims 3,4 *; | [AD]WO9514126 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,6,8,12,13 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 19; claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0702107 (BASF AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820717), vol. 6, no. 131, Database accession no. (C - 114), & JP57055962 A 19820403 (HOWA SENI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |