EP1042085 - A PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SCREWS AND A DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAM S.p.A. 338, Via Cavour 41030 Ponte Motta Cavezzo (Modena) / IT | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHESINI, Vainer Via Seidenari, 4 I-41030 San Prospero / IT | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 98950302.4 | 13.10.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998IT00276 | Priority number, date | IT1997MO00236 | 23.12.1997 Original published format: IT MO970236 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932240 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042085 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042085 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/26 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B21K5/04 (EP,US);
B21C37/26 (EP,US);
B21D11/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49382 (EP,US);
Y10T82/10 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16016 (EP,US);
Y10T82/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHNECKE | [2000/41] | English: | A PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SCREWS AND A DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE PROCESS | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A FABRIQUER DES VIS | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]BE552064 (SOCIÉTÉ CLARKE, CHAPMAN & CO) [A] 1-13 * page 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]JPS60161815 ; | [XA]GB242518 (OTTO RAUCH) [X] 1-3,6-9,13 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,10-12; | [XA]US2939506 (MOORE MARVIN G) [X] 1,6,7,13 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 28; figure - * [A] 2-5,8-12; | [A]DE1452455 (SCHMOELE METALL R & G) [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0677711 (G R B S N C DI GROTTI RENZO & [IT]) [A] 1-13 * column 7, line 5 - line 14; figures 4-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851225), vol. 009, no. 330, Database accession no. (M - 442), & JP60161815 A 19850823 (YAMADA SETSUBI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |