EP1035213 - METHOD FOR ENZYME ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIGAKI, Junji Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. Ashigara Research Laboratories No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Yutaka Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. Ashigara Research Laboratories No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 03 /
HAMAOKA, Tsutomu 525-10, Ojiri Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0011 / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950496.4 | 02.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998JP04958 | Priority number, date | JP19970301614 | 04.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30161497 | [2000/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923245 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035213 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, C12Q1/25 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/37 (EP);
G01N2333/78 (EP);
G01N2333/96486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN VON ENZYMEN | [2000/37] | English: | METHOD FOR ENZYME ASSAY | [2000/37] | French: | METHODE D'ANALYSE D'ENZYMES | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | Translation filed | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 04.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5928494 ; | [X]JPS62278454 |