EP0940003 - DIRECT CURRENT COMMAND GENERATION FOR A STEPPER MOTOR DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMM, William 79 Old Meadowplain Road Weatogue, CT 06089 / US | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2002/25] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98950853.6 | 02.10.1998 | [1999/36] | WO1998US20718 | Priority number, date | US19970942937 | 02.10.1997 Original published format: US 942937 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918655 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940003 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02P8/22 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H02P8/00 (EP,US);
H02P8/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINES GLEICHSTROMBEFEHLS FÜR EINEN SCHRITTMOTORANTRIEB | [1999/36] | English: | DIRECT CURRENT COMMAND GENERATION FOR A STEPPER MOTOR DRIVE | [1999/36] | French: | GENERATION DE COMMANDE EN COURANT CONTINU POUR ENTRAINEMENT PAR MOTEUR PAS-A-PAS | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 10.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4683408 (INOUE AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]US5198741 (SHINADA YASUYUKI [US], et al); | [A]US5252903 (MARUYAMA SHIGEHISA [JP]); | [A]US5359271 (HUSHER FREDERICK K [US]) |