EP1025528 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONSOLIDATING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson, Janice No. 2 Somerset Lane Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950941.9 | 01.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US21006 | Priority number, date | US19970960755 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: US 960755 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9922330 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025528 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06F17/60 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H10/65 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H70/40 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM KONSOLIDIEREN UND VERTEILEN VON INFORMATION | [2000/32] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONSOLIDATING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION | [2000/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONSOLIDATION ET DE REPARTITION DES INFORMATIONS | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 26.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9115817 (ALCOTT WILLIAM D III [US], et al) [X] 1-16,21 * page 1, line 13 - line 25 * * page 3, line 16 - page 8, line 19 * [A] 23-30,32 [Y] 17-20,22,31; | [A]WO9503569 (LAWLOR PATRICK M [US]) [A] 1-32 * page 1, line 3 - page 9, line 32 *; | [Y]WO9613790 (MED E SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 17-19,22,31 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - line 24 *; | [A]US5659741 (EBERHARDT SILVIO P [US]) [A] 1-3,15,16,22,31* column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 67 *; | [YA] - HAMID GHASSEMI ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF AN OPERATIONAL MEDICAL NETWORK (MEDNET) MODEL", PROCEEDINGS OF SOUTHEASTCON, RALEIGH, MAR. 26 - 29, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950326), pages 162 - 164, XP000538650 [Y] 20 * page 162, column L, line 1 - page 163, column L, line 8; figures 1,2 * [A] 22,31 |