EP1023136 - FLUX MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speedline Technologies, Inc. 16 Forge Park Franklin, MA 02038 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUDMORE, Donald, P. 1903 Briar Meadow Drive Arlington, TX 76014 / US | 02 /
BAILEY, Joel, Brad 9042 Angora Street Dallas, TX 75218 / US | 03 /
FORMELLA, Tadeusz 2108 Chrisman Trail Mansfield, TX 76063 / US | 04 /
AVRAMESCU, Sabi 6601 Beddo Court Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | 05 /
PREM, Anthony 28 College Circle Ottawa, Ontario K1K4R7 / CA | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/31] | 01 /
CUDMORE, Donald, P. 1903 Briar Meadow Drive Arlington, TX 76014 / US | ||
02 /
BAILEY, Joel, Brad 9042 Angora Street Dallas, TX 75218 / US | |||
03 /
FORMELLA, Tadeusz 2108 Chrisman Trail Mansfield, TX 76063 / US | |||
04 /
AVRAMESCU, Sabi 6601 Beddo Court Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | |||
05 /
PREM, Anthony 231 Jennifer Lane Arlington, TX 76018 / US | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 18 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98950971.6 | 06.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998US21104 | Priority number, date | US19970951364 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: US 951364 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920425 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023136 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023136 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/008 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
B01D53/002 (EP);
B23K2101/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | FLUSSVERWALTUNGSYSTEM | [2000/31] | English: | FLUX MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2000/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE FLUX | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | BE | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | CY | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | FR | 17.03.2004 | IT | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | DE | 18.06.2004 | ES | 28.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | GB | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | LU | 06.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
CY | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
LU | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
DE | 18.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1807607 (PYRONICS INC) [A] 14-16* page 25, paragraph 3; figure 4 *; | [X]US5345061 (CHANASYK ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13,21-27 * column 7, paragraph L - column 8, paragraph 3; figure 6 *; | [X]US5573688 (CHANASYK ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13,21-27 * column 7, paragraph 3 - column 8, paragraph 3; figure 6 * |