EP0941034 - TRANSANAL ANASTOMOSIS RING INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2004/25] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Tyco Group S.A.R.L. 2nd Floor, 6, avenue Emile Reuter 2420 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Paul, Joseph 368 Whittemore Road Middlebury, CT 06762 / US | 02 /
CORBETT, Robert, Kelly 56 Sherry Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 03 /
CONNERS, John, A. 259 Somerset Avenue Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/37] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98951487.2 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/37] | WO1998EP06265 | Priority number, date | US19970060859P | 02.10.1997 Original published format: US 60859 P | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917662 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941034 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941034 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/1114 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Extension states | AL | 07.06.1999 | LT | 07.06.1999 | LV | 07.06.1999 | MK | 07.06.1999 | RO | 07.06.1999 | SI | 07.06.1999 | Title | German: | EINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN TRANSANAL ANASTOMOSE RING | [1999/37] | English: | TRANSANAL ANASTOMOSIS RING INSERTION DEVICE | [1999/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION D'UNE BAGUE D'ANASTOMOSE PAR LA VOIE ANALE | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 03.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2004 | BE | 26.05.2004 | CH | 26.05.2004 | CY | 26.05.2004 | FI | 26.05.2004 | LI | 26.05.2004 | NL | 26.05.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | LU | 01.10.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
CY | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
LU | 01.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8100668 (JANSEN A [NL]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * page 8, line 12 - page 12, line 31; figure - *; | [A]EP0568774 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1,35,36 * abstract *; | [DX]US5282810 (ALLEN WILLIAM J [US], et al) [DX] 1-8,15,25,26,28,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0671149 (KOECKERLING FERDINAND DR [DE], et al) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US3771526 | US4055186 | US4154241 | US4467804 | US4576167 | US4603693 | US4646745 | US4766898 |