EP1125036 - MAKING UP AND BREAKING OUT OF A TUBING STRING IN A WELL WHILE MAINTAINING CONTINUOUS CIRCULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Well Engineering Partners B.V. Tynaarlosestraat 68 9481 AE Vries / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Kasper Nigeriastraat 53 NL-2622 GB Delft / NL | 02 /
VAN OORD, Jacob Oostblok 247 NL-2612 KR Delft / NL | 03 /
BAKKER, Thomas, Walburgis Tynaarlosestraat 68 NL-9481 AE Vries / NL | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Dijkhuis ev Boon, Anouk Hélène J., et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Boon-Dijkhuis, Anouk Hélène J., et al Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/34] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98951811.3 | 19.10.1998 | [2001/34] | WO1998NL00597 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023686 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125036 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125036 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/16, E21B21/00, E21B21/10, E21B33/068 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
E21B21/106 (EP,US);
E21B19/16 (EP,US);
E21B21/019 (EP,US);
E21B33/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/04] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LÖSEN UND VERBINDEN VON BOHRROHREN BEI KONTINUIERLICHER ZIRKULATION DER SPÜHLUNG | [2001/34] | English: | MAKING UP AND BREAKING OUT OF A TUBING STRING IN A WELL WHILE MAINTAINING CONTINUOUS CIRCULATION | [2001/34] | French: | INSTALLATION ET DESINSTALLATION D'UNE COLONNE DE TUBAGE DANS UN PUITS AVEC MAINTIEN DE LA CIRCULATION CONTINUE D'UN LIQUIDE | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 10.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3559739 (HUTCHISON STANLEY O) [AD] 1,14,25 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4315553 (STALLINGS JIMMIE L) [A] 1,14,25* abstract *; | [A]US4643259 (ZERINGUE JR FREDDIE J [US]) [A] 1,14,25 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]WO9816716 (AYLING JOHN LAURENCE [GB]) [AD] 1,14,25 * abstract * | by applicant | US3559739 | WO9816716 |