EP1024754 - MECHANICAL ANASTOMOSIS SYSTEM FOR HOLLOW STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Interventional Technologies B.V. Singel 208 F 1016 AA Amsterdam / NL | [2007/15] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Innovative Interventional Technologies B.V. Singel 208 F 1016 AA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Suyker, Wilhelmus Jospeh Leonardus Zalmkolk 13 8017 PB Zwolle / NL | ||
For all designated states Suyker, Paulus Thomas Wilhelmus Singel 208 F 1016 AA Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suyker, Wilhelmus J. L. Zalmkolk 13 8017 PB Zwolle / NL | 02 /
Suyker, Paulus T.W. Singel 208 F 1016 AA Amsterdam / NL | [2003/32] |
Former [2000/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman B.V., Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 98951819.6 | 22.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998NL00605 | Priority number, date | NL19971007349 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: NL 1007349 | [2000/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921491 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024754 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024754 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/064, A61B17/11 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1135 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1139 (EP,US);
Y10S227/901 (EP,US);
Y10S227/902 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHES ANASTOMOSENSYSTEM FÜR HOHLSTRUKTUREN | [2000/32] | English: | MECHANICAL ANASTOMOSIS SYSTEM FOR HOLLOW STRUCTURES | [2000/32] | French: | SYSTEME MECANIQUE D'ANASTOMOSES POUR STRUCTURES CREUSES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1998 | Translation filed | 22.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007362.2 / EP1808135 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.2007 | BE | 11.04.2007 | CH | 11.04.2007 | CY | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | IT | 11.04.2007 | LI | 11.04.2007 | NL | 11.04.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | ES | 22.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | LU | 22.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/26] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
BE | 11.04.2007 | ||
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
BE | 11.04.2007 | ||
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
BE | 11.04.2007 | ||
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
BE | 11.04.2007 | ||
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3657744 (ERSEK ROBERT A) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,13 * column 3, lines 1-6; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2822603 (THIERFELDER KAY DR) [A] 14,19 * figures 7-12 *; | [X]US4214587 (SAKURA CHESTER Y JR [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * figures 1,3,6-9 *; | [X]US4368736 (KASTER ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4681110 (WIKTOR DOMINIK M [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]WO8908433 (LAZARUS HARRISON M [US]); | [X]US4872874 (TAHERI SYDE A [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13 * figures 8-12 *; | [X]US5035702 (TAHERI SYDE A [US]) [X] 1-4,9-12 * figures 8,14-19 *; | [X]EP0539237 (COOK INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * column 8; figure 15 *; | [XA]US5234447 (KASTER ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,18 * figures 1-5,10,14-19 * [A] 20; | [A]US5562690 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 19 * figure 13 * | Examination | US5397355 | WO9625886 | WO9727898 | WO9819629 |