EP1028687 - WALKER FORMED SUBSTANTIALLY FROM A POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Douglass, Karl J. 3730 Dogwood Lane Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 98952041.6 | 05.10.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998US20805 | Priority number, date | US19970944317 | 06.10.1997 Original published format: US 944317 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917706 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028687 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/00, A47D13/04 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A61H3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | AUS EINEM POLYMER BESTEHENDE GEHHILFE | [2000/34] | English: | WALKER FORMED SUBSTANTIALLY FROM A POLYMER | [2000/34] | French: | DEAMBULATEUR CONSTITUE PRATIQUEMENT PAR UN POLYMERE | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2001 | 31.10.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2634790 (PAUL ELLE AUGUST); | [A]US4411283 (LUCARELLI FRANK J [US]); | [A]US4907794 (ROSE ERIC P [US]); | [Y]US5201333 (SHALMON SHAY [US], et al); | [A]US5311880 (LANCASTER ERIC B [US], et al); | [A]US5529425 (SPIES JAMES T [US], et al); | [X]US5579793 (GAJEWSKI MARK [US], et al); | [A]US5657783 (SISKO MIKE R [US], et al) |