EP1023733 - FOOD GRADE DIELECTRIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electric Fluids LLC 201 Bethpage Road Plainview, NY 11803 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAPIENZA, Richard 1 Miller Avenue Shoreham, NY 11786 / US | 02 /
SILVERSTEIN, Robert 4 Park Place Great Neck, NY 11024 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98952289.1 | 14.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998US21647 | Priority number, date | US19970951392 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: US 951392 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919884 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023733 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023733 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/22 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H01B3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Extension states | LT | 12.05.2000 | RO | 12.05.2000 | SI | 12.05.2000 | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT LEBENSMITTELQUALITÄT | [2000/31] | English: | FOOD GRADE DIELECTRIC FLUID | [2000/31] | French: | FLUIDE DIELECTRIQUE DE QUALITE ALIMENTAIRE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2001 | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | IE | 14.10.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/06] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.10.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4530782 (MEYER WILLIAM R [US]) [DX] 1-20 * Biodegradable dielectric liquid composition. * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 58 * * column 1, line 32 - line 38 *; | [A]EP0499359 (COOPER POWER SYST [US]) [A] 1-20 * Use of BHT as antioxidant in a saturated hydrocarbon liquid used as a dielectric. ** page 3, line 13 - line 48 * | International search | [Y]US4033854 (OHMORI TADASHI, et al); | [Y]US4072620 (MASUNAGA MIDORI, et al); | [Y]US4284522 (OLMSTED JOHN H); | [Y]US4530782 (MEYER WILLIAM R [US]); | [XP]US5766517 (GOEDDE GARY L [US], et al) |