EP1024749 - ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/32] | ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC HIGH/LOW PRESSURE SWITCHING | ||
[2010/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACIST Medical Systems, Inc. 7905 Fuller Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2008/41] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states ACIST Medical Systems, Inc. 7450 Flying Cloud Drive, Suite 150 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states ACIST Medical Systems, Inc. 10250 Valley View Road, Suite 117 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Invasatec, Inc. 10250 Valley View Road, Suite 117 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCHON, Doug 9630 Foxford Road Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 02 /
PAULSON, Thomas 4322 York Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Robert, F. 7373 Amber Drive Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 04 /
LIU, Jiyan 2758 Dale Roseville Roseville, MN 55113 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Baker, Colin John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Baker, Colin John Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98952397.2 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US22542 | Priority number, date | US19970957801 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 957801 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9921481 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024749 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024749 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61M5/145 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61M5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1403 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3313 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2209/01 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP,US);
A61M5/001 (EP,US);
A61M5/14232 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | ANGIOGRAPHISCHE INJEKTORANORDNUNG | [2010/08] | English: | ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM | [2010/08] | French: | SYSTEME D'INJECTION POUR ANGIOGRAPHIE | [2010/08] |
Former [2000/32] | ANGIOGRAPHISCHE INJEKTORANORDNUNG MIT AUTOMATISCHER UMSCHALTUNG ZWISCHEN HOCH-UND NIEDERDRUCK | ||
Former [2000/32] | ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC HIGH/LOW PRESSURE SWITCHING | ||
Former [2000/32] | SYSTEME D'INJECTION POUR ANGIOGRAPHIE A COMMUTATION DE PRESSION FORTE/FAIBLE AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.01.2010 | 19.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10007356.8 / EP2238907 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/26] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5515851 (GOLDSTEIN JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-22* column 2, line 25 - line 54 *; | [XA]WO9632887 (INVASATEC INC [US]) [X] 1-11,19-22 * the whole document * [A] 12-18; | [XA]WO9632975 (INVASATEC INC [US]) [X] 1-11,19-22 * the whole document * [A] 12-18 | by applicant | US19950426148 |