EP1023338 - PREPARATION OF MULTIMODAL POLYMER COMPOSITIONS USING MULTINUCLEAR METALLOCENE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park California 94025-3493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025-3493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Robert, B., Jr. 1216 Harriet Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953614.9 | 16.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998US21893 | Priority number, date | US19970953028 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: US 953028 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920665 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023338 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F4/642, C08L23/04 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
C08F12/04 (EP,US);
C08F12/08 (KR);
C08F10/00 (KR);
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F12/12 (KR);
C08F14/06 (KR);
C08F14/08 (KR);
C08F14/20 (KR);
C08F20/14 (KR);
C08F20/18 (KR);
C08F20/44 (KR);
C08F36/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (KR);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F2410/03 (EP,US);
C08F2420/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/05 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/31] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MULTIMODALEN POLYMEREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MITTELS MEHRKERNIGER METALLOCENKATALYSATOREN | [2000/31] | English: | PREPARATION OF MULTIMODAL POLYMER COMPOSITIONS USING MULTINUCLEAR METALLOCENE CATALYSTS | [2000/31] | French: | PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES MULTIMODALES AU MOYEN DE CATALYSEURS AU METALLOCENE MULTINUCLEES | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/07] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0654476 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-10,12-17,19,21 * page 15, line 9 - line 20 * * see page 17, line 3 - line 5 and line 37 - line 38 * * claim 1 * * page 4, line 19 - line 30 * * see metallocene compounds 1-9 page 18 - page 20 * * see examples 1,12,29 (table 2) and 36 * [A] 1,1; | [X]EP0739897 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-10,13,15,17,19,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - line 29 * * page 3, line 38 - line 50 * * page 11, line 54 - page 12, line 11 * * page 13, line 51 - line 55 * * claims 1-6 * * examples 1,2 *; | [XA]EP0528041 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-6,12,14-16,19,21 * abstract * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 3 * * see page 9, line 19- line 22 and line 30 - line 35 * * claim 1 * * examples 1,2,7 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0632063 (POLYSAR RUBBER CORP [CA]) [A] 1-8,12,14,17,19,21 * claim 1 * * examples 1,2,11,14 * * page 7, line 52 - page 8, line 22 * | [X] - USHIODA T ET AL, "Synthesis and catalytic properties of ansa-binuclear metallocenes of the Group IV transition metals", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (19960712), vol. 518, no. 1, page 155-166, XP004035869 [X] 1,2,4-6,12,14,21 * see compounds 7-10 page 159 and tables 3,4 page 161 * * page 162, paragraph 2 * * page 164, paragraph 4.11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(96)06198-0 |