EP1032811 - Velocity adaptive control test method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/36] | VELOCITY ADAPTIVE CONTROL TEST SYSTEM | ||
[2005/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation Hamilton Standard Division One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION Hamilton Standard Division, One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION Hamilton Standard, MS 1-2-AB24 One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MODEEN, Douglas, P. 26 Woodcliff Drive Granby, CT 06035 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Bhupindar 192 Mohawk Drive West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2000/36] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98953744.4 | 20.10.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US22120 | Priority number, date | US19970955006 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: US 955006 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920993 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032811 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032811 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01M19/00, G05B23/02 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
G05B23/0256 (EP,US);
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
F01D7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | G01M19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum geschwindigkeitsadaptiven Testen einer Steuerung | [2005/14] | English: | Velocity adaptive control test method | [2005/14] | French: | Procédé adaptatif de vitesse pour le testage de commande | [2005/14] |
Former [2000/36] | GESCHWINDIGKEITSADAPTIVES TESTSYSTEM FÜR STEUERUNG | ||
Former [2000/36] | VELOCITY ADAPTIVE CONTROL TEST SYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/36] | SYSTEME D'ESSAI DE COMMANDE ADAPTATIVE DE VITESSE | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638812 (VEBA KRAFTWERKE RUHR [DE]) [A] 1* column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 12 * | International search | [A]US4158884 (MCKINLEY FREDERICK C, et al); | [A]US5423203 (NAMIKI KOICHI [JP], et al) |