EP1027504 - MECHANICAL RETENTION SYSTEM FOR GROUND ENGAGING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALE, Preston, L. 16517 Woodfield Court Mackinaw, IL 61755-8809 / US | 02 /
LIVESAY, Richard, E. 911 W. Brookforest Drive Peoria, IL 61615-1073 / US | 03 /
STICKLING, Christopher, J. 12911 N. Bland Road Dunlap, IL 61525-9636 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953920.0 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US22448 | Priority number, date | US19970961304 | 30.10.1997 Original published format: US 961304 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923315 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027504 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
E02F9/2825 (EP);
E02F9/2841 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/33] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN GRUND EINGREIFFENDE WERKZEUGE | [2000/33] | English: | MECHANICAL RETENTION SYSTEM FOR GROUND ENGAGING TOOLS | [2000/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE RETENTION MECANIQUE POUR INSTRUMENTS VENANT EN CONTACT AVEC LE SOL | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 09.08.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2325991 (WHITE MARSHALL J) [A] 1,2,6,12,13,16 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, column R, line 24 - line 36 * * page 1, column R, line 46 - page 2, column L, line 37 *; | [A]FR2596785 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,12,13,16 * figures 1,2 * * page 6, line 13 - line 37 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 8 *; | [A]US5088214 (JONES LARREN F [US]) [A] 1,2,8,12,13,16 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 4 *; | [A]FR2165180 (BOURLIER JACQUES) [A] 1,6,16 * figure . * * column 3, line 2 *; | [A]US2861362 (MAURICE LIARD, et al) [A] 1,12,16 * figure - *; | [A]DE1652484 (DELORO UGINE CARBONE); | [A]US2610417 (CRAWFORD ARTHUR N) |