EP1023554 - TUBING COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/31] | TUBING COUPLING AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2002/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMANN, Klaus Friedenstrasse 2 D-74357 Bönnigheim / DE | 02 /
LEIPELT, Rudolf Fohlenbergstrasse 7/1 D-71672 Marbach / DE | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98954390.5 | 10.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998EP06433 | Priority number, date | DE1997145192 | 13.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19745192 | [2000/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919658 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023554 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023554 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B29C65/14 (EP,US);
B29C65/66 (EP,US);
B29C66/534 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73715 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
F16L47/22 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP);
Y10S285/905 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, MC, SE [2001/04] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNG | [2002/23] | English: | TUBING COUPLING | [2002/23] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAUX | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/31] | ROHRVERBINDUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2000/31] | TUBING COUPLING AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [2000/31] | RACCORD DE TUYAUX ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 14.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 16.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, NL, PT | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.01.2003 | IT | 08.01.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 08.01.2003 | |
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | SE | 08.04.2003 | |
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB903757 (MONTEDISON SPA) [AD] 1,4,5 * figures 4-6; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9423237 (WIRSBO ROHRPROD UND VERTR GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0253712 (HUTCHINSON SA [FR]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * |