EP1042964 - SWEETENER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Hirotoshi, Res. Lab., Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Takeshi, Res. Lab., Ajinomoto Co., Inc 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP | 03 /
TAKEMOTO, Tadashi, Res. Lab., Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Yuichi, Res. Lab., Ajinomoto Co., Inc 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 0-0801 / JP | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2000/41] | Application number, filing date | 98954772.4 | 20.11.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998JP05237 | Priority number, date | JP19970352729 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35272997 | [2000/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932000 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042964 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042964 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, C07K5/06, C07D291/06, C07K1/12 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A23L27/32 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | A23L1/236 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | SUESSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/41] | English: | SWEETENER COMPOSITION | [2000/41] | French: | COMPOSITION EDULCORANTE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | Translation filed | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 03.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2005 | FI | 04.05.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | SE | 04.08.2005 | ES | 15.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | IE | 21.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/49] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 04.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4158068 (LUCK ERICH [DE], et al) [DX] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 53; example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0137326 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [A] 1-4* page 6, line 1 - line 8 *; | [X]EP0334617 (TATE & LYLE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4 * example 4; claims 1,7,8,12 *; | [X]US5164214 (WILD RAINER [DE]) [X] 1 * examples 1,5; claims 1,3,14 *; | [A]EP0514937 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 35 - line 58; example -; claims 1-5; table 1 *; | [X]WO9620608 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 9; examples 1,10; claims 1,4,6; table 1 *; | [X] - LANTON B ISBN 0-905003-11-X, "Recent developments in sweetener synergies.", FOOD INDUSTRIES OF SOUTH AFRICA 1988, vol. 41, no. 2, page 23, 25, XP000991369 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - AYYA N ET AL, "Quantitative and qualitative evaluation of high-intensity sweeteners and sweetener mixtures.", CHEMICAL SENSES 1992 CORRESPONDENCE (REPRINT) ADDRESS, H. T. LAWLESS, DEP. OF FOOD SCI., CORNELL UNIV., ITHACA, NY 14853, USA, vol. 17, no. 3, pages 245 - 259, XP000991203 [A] 1-4 * page 248, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH01211468 (RUDOLF BUIRUTO GMBH & CO KG); | [A]JPH04346769 (AJINOMOTO KK) |