EP1025485 - MULTIFUNCTION BIPARTITE LOOK-UP TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/32] | MULTIFUNCTION FLOATING POINT ADDITION/SUBTRACTION PIPELINE AND BIPARTITE LOOK-UP TABLE | ||
[2001/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERMAN, Stuart, F. 1032 Bleubonnet drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
JUFFA, Norbert 460 Navaro Way 201 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Mark, E. 102 Glen Alpine Court Montain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Frederick, D. 1137 Settle Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 05 /
CHERUKURI, Ravi, Krishna 952 Big Bear Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 06 /
RAMANI, Krishnan 655 South Fair Oaks Avenue G201 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2000/39] |
Former [2000/32] | 01 /
OBERMAN, Stuart, F. 265 G. South Bay View Avenue G Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
02 /
JUFFA, Norbert 460 Navaro Way 201 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | |||
03 /
ROBERTS, Mark, E. 2626 Ohlone Drive San Jose, CA 95132 / US | |||
04 /
WEBER, Frederick, D. 1137 Settle Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | |||
05 /
CHERUKURI, Ravi, Krishna 952 Big Bear Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
06 /
RAMANI, Krishnan 655 South Fair Oaks Avenue G201 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98955071.0 | 22.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US22453 | Priority number, date | US19970063601P | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 63601 P | US19970063600P | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 63600 P | US19980015084 | 29.01.1998 Original published format: US 15084 | US19980049851 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49851 | US19980049863 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49863 | US19980049893 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49893 | US19980049750 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49750 | US19980049758 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49758 | US19980055916 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: US 55916 | US19980098482 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: US 98482 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9923548 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1025485 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025485 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
H03M7/24 (EP);
G06F17/16 (EP);
G06F7/483 (EP);
G06F7/509 (EP);
G06F9/30014 (EP);
G06F9/30021 (EP);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/30038 (EP,US);
G06F9/3017 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/32] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONNELLE ZWEITEILIGE NACHSCHLAGETABELLE | [2001/01] | English: | MULTIFUNCTION BIPARTITE LOOK-UP TABLE | [2001/01] | French: | TABLE DE CONSULTATION BIPARTITE MTILTIFONCTIONNELLE | [2001/01] |
Former [2000/32] | MULTIFUNKTIONNELLES GLEITKOMMA-ADDITIONS/SUBTRAKTIONS-FLIESSBAND UND ZWEITEILIGE NACHSCHLAGETABELLE | ||
Former [2000/32] | MULTIFUNCTION FLOATING POINT ADDITION/SUBTRACTION PIPELINE AND BIPARTITE LOOK-UP TABLE | ||
Former [2000/32] | PIPELINE D'ADDITION/SOUSTRACTION A VIRGULE FLOTTANTE MULTIFONCTION ET TABLE DE CONSULTATION BIPARTITE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00203249.8 / EP1061436 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/17] | DE | 13.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9418632 (PICKETT LESTER CARYL [US]); | [A]US5369607 (OKAMOTO FUYUKI [JP]); |