EP1123197 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING ELASTOMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HART, James, Michael 4822 South Main Street Akron, OH 44319 / US | 02 /
BENZING, James, Alfred, II 1930 Mount Pleasant Street, N.W. North Canton, OH 44720 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2001/33] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98955097.5 | 20.10.1998 | [2001/33] | WO1998US22548 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023261 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123197 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123197 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/46 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B29D30/46 (EP);
B26D7/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON ELASTOMEREN MATERIALIEN | [2001/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING ELASTOMERIC MATERIALS | [2001/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DECOUPE DE MATERIAUX ELASTOMERES | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.10.2003 | [2004/45] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4409872 (BERTOLDO GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1,14 * column 6, line 13 - line 31; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0324199 (VMI EPE HOLLAND [NL]) [A] 1,14 |