EP1032616 - RUBBER TO METAL BONDING BY SILANE COUPLING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van der Aar, Cornelis P.J. Golsstraat 79 7553 ME Hengelo / NL | For all designated states Van Ooij, Wim J. 154 Annandale Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98955101.5 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US22576 | Priority number, date | US19970062738P | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 62738 P | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920705 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032616 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/04, C09J4/00, C09D4/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C23C22/48 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09J183/04 (EP,US);
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C09J5/02 (EP,US);
C09J5/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09J2301/504 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/04 (EP,US);
C09J4/00, C08G77/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/36] | C09J5/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/36] | Title | German: | HAFTUNG VON GUMMI AUF METALL DURCH SILANKUPPLUNGSREAGENZIEN | [2000/36] | English: | RUBBER TO METAL BONDING BY SILANE COUPLING AGENTS | [2000/36] | French: | COLLAGE CAOUTCHOUC SUR METAL PAR DES AGENTS DE COUPLAGE RENFERMANT UN SILANE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 09.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4689085 (PLUEDDEMANN EDWIN P [US]) [X] 1-11,13-18* example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9604339 (LORD CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7-13,15-18 * page 1 * * page 7, line 4 * | International search | [X]JPS53232 (TORAY SILICONE CO); | [X]US4179537 (RYKOWSKI JOHN J [US]); | [Y]US4534815 (HAMADA MITSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4618389 (AGODOA MICHAEL K [US]); | [Y]US4681636 (SAITO MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5363994 (ANGELINE BARRY D [US]) |