EP1027055 - 3-CARBOALKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H)-ONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOWARD UNIVERSITY 2400 6th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20059 / US | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Kenneth, R. 9816 Cottrell Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20903 / US | 02 /
LAWS, Mia, L. 2510 N. Monroe Street Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Ralph, R. 9758, 85 th Street Place South Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | 04 /
NICHOLSON, Jesse, M. 11706 Carol Ann Court Upper Marlboro, MD 20774-3515 / US | [2003/01] |
Former [2000/33] | 01 /
SCOTT, Kenneth, R. 9816 Cottrell Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20903 / US | ||
02 /
LAWS, Mia, L. 2510 N. Monroe Street Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | |||
03 /
ROBERTS, Ralph, R. 7838 Hearthsite Avenue South Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | |||
04 /
NICHOLSON, Jesse, M. 11706 Carol Ann Court Upper Marlboro, MD 20774-3515 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98955131.2 | 27.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US22693 | Priority number, date | US19970958320 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: US 958320 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9921560 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027055 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027055 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5415, A61P25/08, A61P25/12 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
C07D279/20 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | A61K31/54, C07D279/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | 3-CARBOALKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H)-ONE DERIVATE | [2003/06] | English: | 3-CARBOALKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H)-ONE DERIVATIVES | [2000/33] | French: | DERIVES DE LA 3-CARBOYLKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H]-ONE | [2003/06] |
Former [2000/33] | 3-CARBOALKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-IH-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H)-ONE DERIVATE | ||
Former [2000/33] | DERIVES DE 3-CARBOYLKOXY-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H]-ONE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.01.2004 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE3229122 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0101898 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [D]DE3426564 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0174458 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - * | International search | [X]DE3426564 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]US4636497 (NIEMERS EKKEHARD [DE], et al); | [X] - STN CAPLUS, (19000101), Database accession no. 1984-120987, XP002916235 | [X] - MIYANO S, ABE N, SUMOTO K, "SYNTHESIS OF 2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-PHENOTHIAZIN-4(10H)-ONES", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS., CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH., GB, GB, (19750101), doi:10.1039/c3975000760a, ISSN 0022-4936, page 760, XP002916236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3975000760a | [X] - MIYANO S, ET AL., "REACTIONS OF ENAMINO-KETONES. PART II. SYNTHEIS OF 4H-1,4-BENZO-THIAZINES", Journal of the Chemical Society, Perkin Transactions 1, Royal Society of Chemistry, GB, GB, (19760101), doi:10.1039/p19760001146, ISSN 0300-922X, pages 1146 - 1149, XP002916237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19760001146 |