EP1103150 - TELECOMMUNICATION METHOD AND SUITABLE SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A CONNECTION WITH A MOBILE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom Mobile AG Schwarztorstrasse 61 3050 Bern / CH | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Michael Kappelenring 21 CH-3032 Hinterkappelen / CH | 02 /
HIRZEL, Werner Bifitstrasse 63 CH-3145 Niederscherli / CH | 03 /
MEIER, Martin Königweg 1 CH-3006 Bern / CH | 04 /
STADELMANN, Anton, Niklaus Bodenacker 69 CH-3065 Bolligen / CH | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98955304.5 | 02.12.1998 | [2001/22] | WO1998CH00510 | Priority number, date | CH19980001585 | 27.07.1998 Original published format: CH 158598 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007391 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103150 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103150 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04M15/8038 (EP,US);
H04M15/85 (EP,US);
H04M15/851 (EP,US);
H04M15/853 (EP,US);
H04M15/854 (EP,US);
H04M3/42195 (EP,US);
H04M3/42382 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04M2203/652 (EP,US);
H04M2203/654 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2046 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/34 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7442 (EP,US);
H04M2215/815 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND GEEIGNETES SYSTEM, UM EINE VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM MOBILGERÄT AUFZUBAUEN | [2001/22] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATION METHOD AND SUITABLE SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A CONNECTION WITH A MOBILE STATION | [2001/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE TELECOMMUNICATION ET SYSTEME APPROPRIE POUR ETABLIR UNE COMMUNICATION AVEC UN APPAREIL MOBILE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 08.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9719548 (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 7, line 8 - page 13, line 27 *; | [X]WO9729609 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,13,18 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 20 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 8 *; | [A]WO9740616 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-23 * page 33, line 22 - page 36, line 10 * * page 38, line 27 - page 40, line 9 *; | [A]WO9750237 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1-23* column W * |