EP0958195 - METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES USING AN INSTALLATION WITH SPUTTER ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Thomas Rossbühlstrasse 1 D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 02 /
VOIGT, Johannes Stoeckhofstrasse 47 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
LUCAS, Susanne Belaustrasse 9 D-70195 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Gleiss & Grosse Maybachstrasse 6 A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98955326.8 | 15.09.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998DE02726 | Priority number, date | DE19971040793 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740793 | [1999/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9914390 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0958195 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958195 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/05 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
C23C16/517 (EP,US);
C23C14/0036 (EP,US);
C23C14/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPUTTERBESCHICHTUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [1999/47] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES USING AN INSTALLATION WITH SPUTTER ELECTRODES | [1999/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT DE SURFACES AU MOYEN D'UNE INSTALLATION DOTEE D'ELECTRODES DE DEPOT PAR PULVERISATION | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 02.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4343042 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,18-20,27,29 * column 4, line 36 - line 47 * * column 5, line 14 - line 61 *; | [A]DE19506515 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19537263 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-29 * column 3, line 23 - line 55 * * column 4, line 49 - line 63 *; | [A]EP0736612 (OELHAFEN PETER [CH], et al) [A] 22,24-26 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0583736 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 25 * column 12, line 37 - line 48 *; | [A]JPS5655564 ; | [XA] - FRACH P ET AL, "The double ring magnetron process module-a tool for stationary deposition of metals, insulators and reactive sputtered compounds", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, 15 MARCH 1997, ELSEVIER, SWITZERLAND, ISSN 0257-8972, vol. 90, no. 1-2, pages 75 - 81, XP002094930 [X] 1,2 * paragraph [04.4] * [A] 3-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(96)03096-4 | [A] - SCHOLL R A, "ASYMMETRIC BIPOLAR PULSED POWER. A NEW POWER TECHNOLOGY", LE VIDE: SCIENCE, TECHNIQUE ET APPLICATIONS, (19960401), vol. 52, no. 280, pages 237 - 243, XP000599220 [A] 1-29 * page 241, line 1 - line 23 * | [A] - KUSAKA K ET AL, "EFFECT OF NITROGEN GAS PRESSURE ON RESIDUAL STRESS IN AIN FILMS DEPOSITED BY THE PLANAR MAGNETRON SPUTTERING SYSTEM", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19960801), vol. 281/282, no. 1/02, pages 340 - 343, XP000643420 [A] 11,16 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(96)08633-6 | [A] - YOSHIO MANABE ET AL, "ZINC OXIDE THIN FILMS PREPARED BY THE ELECTRON-CYCLOTRON-RESONANCE PLASMA SPUTTERING METHOD", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19900201), vol. 29, no. 2, PART 01, pages 334 - 339, XP000116850 [A] 14,28 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.29.334 | [A] - SHEW B -Y ET AL, "Effects of r.f. bias and nitrogen flow rates on the reactive sputtering of TiAlN films", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19970130), vol. 293, no. 1-2, page 212-219, XP004080859 [A] 24,26 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(96)09038-4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810804), vol. 005, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 065), & JP56055564 A 19810516 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [A] 21,22 * abstract * | [A] - SMITH P.H., "Method of Varying Composition of Multi Component. Sputtered Films. November 1981.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (198111), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 2962 - 2963, XP002094096 [A] 23 * the whole document * |