EP1035898 - DEVICE FOR MOVING ON SNOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDEAU, Jo[l Résidence Fer Donjon F-74410 Saint-Jorioz / FR | [2000/38] | Application number, filing date | 98955726.9 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998FR02504 | Priority number, date | FR19970015359 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715359 | [2000/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928007 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035898 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/02, A63C7/02 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
A63C7/02 (EP);
A63C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [2000/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN AUF SCHNEE | [2000/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR MOVING ON SNOW | [2000/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT SUR NEIGE | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/22] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR676067 (GUEYDAN) [A] 1,5,6,9 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4593926 (PERGOLA NICOLA F [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]CH660848 (TOEDI SPORT AG GLARUS) [A] 1,4,5,7,9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29516108U (SCHMIDT GABRIEL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 2 *; | [PA]DE19621756 (SCHRANZ PHILIPP [CH]) [PA] 1-3 * figures 1-3A * |