EP1027409 - BLENDED COMPRESSION-IGNITION FUEL CONTAINING LIGHT SYNTHETIC CRUDE AND BLENDING STOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Kansas Center for Research, Inc. Youngberg Hall, 2385 Irving Hill Road Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | [2011/27] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states University of Kansas Center for Research, Inc. Youngberg Hall, 2385 Irving Hill Road Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states University of Kansa Center for Research, Inc. Youngberg Hall, 2385 Irving Hill Road Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUPPES, Galen, J. 532 Canyon Drive Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr. Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98956227.7 | 26.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US22703 | Priority number, date | US19970063310 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: US 63310 | US19970067554 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: US 67554 | US19980085937 | 19.05.1998 Original published format: US 85937 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9921943 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027409 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027409 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1027409 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/18, C10L1/16, C10L1/02, C10L1/08 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
C10L1/14 (EP,US);
C10L1/026 (EP,US);
C10L1/08 (EP,US);
C10L1/10 (EP,US);
C10L10/02 (EP,US);
C10L10/12 (EP,US);
C10L10/16 (EP,US);
C10L1/125 (EP,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,US);
C10L1/1616 (EP,US);
C10L1/1824 (EP,US);
C10L1/1852 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | C10L1/18, C10L1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | TREIBSTOFFMISCHUNG FÜR KOMPRESSIONSZÜNDMASCHINE MIT LEICHTEN SYNTHETISCHEN ROH- UND MISCHBESTANDTEILEN | [2000/33] | English: | BLENDED COMPRESSION-IGNITION FUEL CONTAINING LIGHT SYNTHETIC CRUDE AND BLENDING STOCK | [2000/33] | French: | MELANGE DE CARBURANT D'ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION CONTENANT DU BRUT SYNTHETIQUE LEGER ET UNE BASE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE SASOL Technology (Pty) Ltd. 1 Sturdee Avenue Rosebank 2196 / ZA Opponent's representative Pillep, Bernhard Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE SASOL Technology (Pty) Ltd. 1 Sturdee Avenue Rosebank 2196 / ZA Opponent's representative Pillep, Bernhard Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | 27.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.01.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.05.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1063/08 | 18.08.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2005 | BE | 17.08.2005 | CH | 17.08.2005 | ES | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | FR | 17.08.2005 | IT | 17.08.2005 | LI | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | IE | 26.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | DE | 18.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
ES | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
ES | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
FR | 18.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
ES | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
FR | 18.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
ES | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
FR | 18.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4294586 (COX JR CHARLES P); | [Y]US4652538 (RABO JULE A [US], et al); | [Y]US5324335 (BENHAM CHARLES B [US], et al); | [Y]US5506272 (BENHAM CHARLES B [US], et al); | [Y]US5645613 (BENHAM CHARLES B [US], et al); | [AP]US5782936 (RILEY RICHARD A [US]); | [YP]US5807413 (WITTENBRINK ROBERT JAY [US], et al); | [YP]US5814109 (COOK BRUCE R [US], et al) | Opposition | US4603662 | US5720784 | - PAUL W. SCHABERG ET AL., "Diesel exhaust emissions using sasol slurry phase distillate process fuels", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES 97288, (1997), pages 123 - 138 | - K. TSURUTANI ET AL., "The effects of fuel properties and oxygenates on diesel exhaust emissions", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES 952349, (1995), pages 1 - 12 |