EP0958511 - ACOUSTIC POSITIONING OF SEISMIC OCEAN BOTTOM CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ion Geophysical Corporation 11104 West Airport Blvd Suite 200 Stafford TX 77477-2416 / US | [2008/12] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Input/Output, Inc. 11104 West Airport Blvd, Suite 200 Stafford, Texas 77477-2416 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, Paul, Ellington 12203 Mile Drive Houston, TX 77065 / US | 02 /
JAMES, Roy, Wilson, III 903 Chippenham Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 03 /
BEDNAR, Eugene, David 9134 Troulon Drive Houston, TX 77036 / US | 04 /
RICE, Charles, Geoffrey 2527 Buffalo Trail Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 05 /
BYERLY, Kent, A. 822 Devonport Lane Seabrook, TX 77586 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98956316.8 | 29.10.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998US22943 | Priority number, date | US19970963676 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: US 963676 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923510 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958511 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958511 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/38, G01V1/18 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G01V1/201 (EP,US);
G01V1/3835 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | G01V1/38, G01V1/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/47] | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHE POSITIONIERUNG EINES SEISMISCHES OZEANBODENKABELS | [1999/47] | English: | ACOUSTIC POSITIONING OF SEISMIC OCEAN BOTTOM CABLE | [1999/47] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT ACOUSTIQUE D'UN CABLE SISMIQUE SUR LE FOND OCEANIQUE | [2007/27] |
Former [1999/47] | POSITIONNEMENT ACOUSTIQUE DE FLUTE SISMIQUE POUR FOND OCEANIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5497356 (NORTON JR JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1,8,12,14,18-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5668775 (HATTELAND KJELL [NO]) [A] 1,8,12,14,18-21 * claim 1 *; | [A] - EDINGTON B L ET AL, "OCEAN BOTTOM RECEIVER LOCATION: A MODEL-BASED SOLUTION TO LOCATING RECEIVERS ON THE OCEAN BOTTOM BY USING GEOPHYSICAL DATA", ANNUAL OFFSHORE TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (1993), pages 17 - 23, XP000676032 [A] 1,8,12,14,18-21 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5166905 (CURRIE WILLIAM S [US]) |