EP1029003 - USE OF DIMERDIOLALKOXYLATES AS ADDITIVES IN THE PRODUCTION OF PIGMENT CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/17] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFER, Rainer Klever Strasse 31 D-40477 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Heinz-Günther Winsterstrasse 66 D-45481 Mülheim / DE | 03 /
RATHS, Hans-Christian Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 13 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 04 /
FROMMELIUS, Harald Seefelderweg 2 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
GOLLNICK, Stefan Uhlandstrasse 12 D-41464 Neuss / DE | 06 /
PEGELOW, Ulrich Benrodestrasse 33 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 98956872.0 | 24.10.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998EP06763 | Priority number, date | DE1997148575 | 04.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19748575 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923173 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029003 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029003 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/20, C09B67/46, C09D17/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
C09B67/0066 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
D01F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/34] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DIMERDIOLALKOXYLATEN ALS ADDITIVE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIGMENTKONZENTRATEN | [2000/34] | English: | USE OF DIMERDIOLALKOXYLATES AS ADDITIVES IN THE PRODUCTION OF PIGMENT CONCENTRATES | [2000/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE DIMERDIOLALCOXYLATES EN TANT QU'ADDITIFS POUR LA PREPARATION DE CONCENTRES DE PIGMENTS | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0925443 ; | CS217250 [ ]; | [A]JPH09143416 ; | [Y]FR2160507 (BASF AG) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, lines 3-30; examples 18,19 *; | [A]EP0002683 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]EP0585571 (GLIDDEN CO [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE19511669 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 14, Database accession no. 97-149915, XP002095492 & JPH0925443 A 19970128 (SAKATA INKS CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860324), vol. 104, no. 12, Database accession no. 90588, XP002095491 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 32, Database accession no. 97-347659, XP002095493 & JPH09143416 A 19970603 (SAKATA INKS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |