EP1027245 - RAIL VEHICLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIER, Michael Sankt-Ingberter-Strasse 2 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James Howrey Simon Arnold & White City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Akers, Noel James Howrey Simon Arnold & White, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98956898.5 | 30.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998EP06886 | Priority number, date | DE1997148732 | 05.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19748732 | DE1998119094 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819094 | [2000/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924304 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027245 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027245 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/12, B61D3/10, B61D3/12, B61C3/00 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B61C3/00 (EP,US);
B61D3/10 (EP,US);
B61D3/12 (EP,US);
B61F3/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/33] | Title | German: | SCHIENENFAHRZEUGSYSTEM | [2000/33] | English: | RAIL VEHICLE SYSTEM | [2000/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE VEHICULE SUR RAIL | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB951922 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 74 - page 2, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9309351U (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE4419851 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19520549 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 10, line 20; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO9721558 (STICPEWICH JOHN WARREN [AU]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 8 - page 8, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - "SELBSTANGETRIEBENE TRANSPORTEINHEIT FÜR DIE DB AG", ZEV + DET GLAS. ANN., (199701), vol. 121, no. 1, pages 36 - 37, XP000678390 [A] 1 * the whole document * |