EP1068460 - IMPROVED ELASTOMERIC IMPACT ABSORBER WITH VISCOUS DAMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Courtney, William Alexander 17 Vale Road, Timperley Altrincham Cheshire WA15 7TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Courtney, William Alexander 17 Vale Road, Timperley Altrincham, Cheshire WA15 7TQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Courtney, William 19 Finden Road Baguley, Manchester M23 1WN / GB | ||
For all designated states Courtney, William Alexander 17 Vale Road, Timperley Altrincham, Cheshire WA15 7TQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURTNEY, William, Alexander 17 Vale Road, Timperley, Altrincham Cheshire WA15 7TQ / GB | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 98957011.4 | 02.12.1998 | [2001/03] | WO1998GB03594 | Priority number, date | GB19980005889 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805889 | GB19980012378 | 10.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9812378 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949236 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068460 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068460 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16F5/00, F16F9/00, F16F9/30, A62C3/00, A41D13/00, A43B7/32, B60K15/00, B60R21/00, A62B35/00, B64D25/00, D06F37/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F16F13/00 (EP);
A41D13/015 (EP);
A43B13/189 (EP);
A43B21/265 (EP);
B64D1/14 (EP);
B64D25/00 (EP);
F16F1/376 (EP);
F16F3/00 (EP);
F16F7/00 (EP);
F16F9/30 (EP);
B60K15/00 (EP);
B60R2021/0407 (EP);
B60R21/0136 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/26] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER, ELASTOMERER AUFPRALLDÄMPFER MIT VISKOSER DÄMPFUNG | [2001/03] | English: | IMPROVED ELASTOMERIC IMPACT ABSORBER WITH VISCOUS DAMPING | [2001/03] | French: | AMORTISSEUR ELASTOMERE PERFECTIONNE A AMORTISSEMENT VISQUEUX | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.09.2002 | NL | 18.09.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
DE | 19.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
DE | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9725551 (COURTNEY WILLIAM ALEXANDER) [DX] 1,31-33,38-41,43-49 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 19, paragraph 1; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,4,6,14,34-37; | [X]US4566565 (WICKE BRIAN G) [X] 1,30,31,33 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 5; figure - *; | [XA]US4751757 (MORENO CARLOS) [X] 1 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 19; figure - * [A] 4,6; | [XA]US4647258 (MASSARSCH KARL R) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 30,36,37; | [A]US5564202 (HOPPENSTEIN REUBEN) [A] 1,2,36-38 * column W *; | [A]DE2701181 (PICKER) [A] 1,6,30-34 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]WO9716084 (WELSH NICOLE) [A] 1,4,6,14,38,41 * abstract *; | [A]US5190248 (LEE PETER R) [A] 1,4,6 * column W *; | [A]FR2738998 (AFFERGAN MARCEL) [A] 1,4,6,14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9201585 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC) [A] 1,30,43 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO1996GB03243 |