EP1036130 - METHOD OF PREPARING HIGH BRIGHTNESS, SHORTER PERSISTENCE ZINC ORTHOSILICATE PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states Senior, Alan Murray J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Senior, Alan Murray J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Senior, Alan Murray J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVILISETTY, P., Rao 349 Plutarch Road Highland, NY 12528 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/38] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98957032.0 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998GB03617 | Priority number, date | US19970985128 | 04.12.1997 Original published format: US 985128 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928409 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036130 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036130 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/59, C01B33/20 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C09K11/595 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/20 (KR);
C04B35/624 (KR);
C01P2004/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZINKORTHOSILIKAT-PHOSPHORS MIT HOHER HELLIGKEIT UND KURZNACHLEUCHTE | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING HIGH BRIGHTNESS, SHORTER PERSISTENCE ZINC ORTHOSILICATE PHOSPHOR | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DU PHOSPHORE D'ORTHOSILICATE DE ZINC A FORTE BRILLANCE ET A PERSISTANCE REDUITE | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2084488 ; | [A]JPH01272689 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 11, Database accession no. 98-119058, XP002094423 & RU2084488 C 19970720 (MOSC MENDELEEV CHEM TECHN INST) [A] 1,4,11,12,15,23-27 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 49, Database accession no. 89-361801, XP002094424 & JPH01272689 A 19891031 (UBE IND LTD) [A] 1,4,11,12,15,23-27 * abstract * |