EP1039956 - LEARNING AID DEVICE FOR GLIDE TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zagury, Alain Chemin de la Perrousaz 4 1286 Soral / CH | [2000/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Kiliaridis, Constantin Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98957100.5 | 16.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998IB02044 | Priority number, date | FR19970015970 | 16.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715970 | FR19980010656 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810656 | [2000/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930786 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039956 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/16, A63C11/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
A63C11/00 (EP);
A63C5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2000/40] | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG ZUM LERNEN VON GLEITSPORTARTEN | [2000/40] | English: | LEARNING AID DEVICE FOR GLIDE TRAINING | [2000/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE A L'APPRENTISSAGE D'UN SPORT DE GLISSE | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4505681 (JONES KENT R [US]) [A] 1-5,11,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4509921 (BUCHHEISTER SUE [US], et al) [A] 1-5,11,13 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]DE3336710 (STRUNK HARALD) [A] 1,7,8,10 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 2,4,6 *; | [A]EP0279648 (SADLER STANLEY) [A] 8,9 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3567239 (KITTERMAN DONALD M) [A] 9,10 * column 4, paragraph 5; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | EP0561125 | WO9204952 |