EP0962400 - Dispenser for a low cross-linking-density gel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/49] | DISPENSER AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR | ||
[2004/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inagaki, Takeo 30-7, Nakatehara, 2-chome Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken, 222-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Inagaki, Takeo 30-7, Nakatehara, 2-chome Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 222-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAGAKI, Takeo 30-7, Nakatehara 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-si, Kanagawa-ken, 222-0023 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Naomi 24-7, Kotehasidai 4-chome, Hanamigawaku Chiba-si, Chiba-ken 262-0005 / JP | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98957200.3 | 07.12.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998JP05516 | Priority number, date | JP19970369768 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36976897 | JP19980155113 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: JP 15511398 | [1999/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930984 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962400 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962400 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, G02B6/36 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C08J3/24 (EP,US);
G02B6/382 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/3825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/49] | Title | German: | Spender für ein niedrig vernetzbares Gel | [2004/25] | English: | Dispenser for a low cross-linking-density gel | [2004/25] | French: | Distributeur pour un gel faiblement reticulé | [2004/25] |
Former [1999/49] | VERTEILER UND VERBINDER FÜR OPTISCHEN FASERN | ||
Former [1999/49] | DISPENSER AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR | ||
Former [1999/49] | DISTRIBUTEUR ET CONNECTEUR A FIBRES OPTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1999 | Translation filed | 09.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4498904 (TURNER ROBERT C [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * column 11, line 18 - column 12, line 55; figures 15-19 * | International search | [Y]JPH03240678 (AISIN SANGYO KK); | [Y]JPS4880937U ; | [Y]JPS58500470 ; | [Y]JPS62137065 (ISONO KEINOSUKE); | [X]JPS62149005U ; | [A]JPH0481704 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) |