EP1027717 - CATHODOLUMINESCENT SCREEN WITH A COLUMNAR STRUCTURE, AND THE METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystalls and Technologies, Ltd. 15-1, Garibaldi Str. 117335 Moscow / RU | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Givargizov, Evgeny Invievich ul. Obrucheva, 20-12 Moscow, 117421 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIVARGIZOV, Evgeny Invievich ul. Obrucheva, 20-12 Moscow, 117421 / RU | 02 /
ZADOROZHNAYA, Ljudmila Alexandrovna ul. M.Uliyanovoi, 12-121 Moscow, 117331 / RU | 03 /
STEPANOVA, Alla Nikolaevna 3-ya Frunzenskaya ul., 9-149 Moscow, 119270 / RU | 04 /
SOSHHIN, Naum Petrovich pr. Mira, 10-54, Moskovskaya obl. Fryazino, 141120 / RU | 05 /
CHUBUN, Nikolai Nikolaevich ul. Polevaya, 19-56, Moskovskaya obl. Fryazino, 141120 / RU | 06 /
GIVARGIZOV, Mikhail Evgenievich ul. Vargi, 1-115 Moscow, 117133 / RU | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Einsel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte, Einsel & Kollegen, Jasperalle 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 98957250.8 | 26.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998RU00347 | Priority number, date | RU19970117737 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: RU 97117737 | RU19970122024 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: RU 97122024 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922394 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027717 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027717 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/18, H01J9/22 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H01J9/22 (EP,US);
H01J29/18 (KR);
H01J29/20 (EP,US);
H01J29/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | KATHODOLUMINESZENZSCHIRM MIT SÄULENFÖRMIGER STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2000/33] | English: | CATHODOLUMINESCENT SCREEN WITH A COLUMNAR STRUCTURE, AND THE METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION | [2000/33] | French: | ECRAN CATHODIQUE LUMINESCENT POSSEDANT UNE STRUCTURE EN COLONNES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 25.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2004 | CH | 08.09.2004 | LI | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5588249 ; | [A]US3535138 (WANMAKER WILLEM LAMBERTUS, et al) [A] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4239791 (SONODA TOMIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4556620 (THOMPSON ROBERT P [US]) [A] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0481465 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO9418694 (SILICON VIDEO CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 46 *; | [A]US5378962 (GRAY HENRY F [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5445846 (YOSHIDA ATSUYA [JP]) [A] 5* claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO9526037 (FED CORP [US]) [A] 14,15 * claim 10 *; | [A]WO9719460 (CANDESCENT TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800918), vol. 004, no. 133, Database accession no. (E - 026), & JP55088249 A 19800703 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |