EP1075776 - LOW VOLTAGE PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materials Systems Incorporated 521 Great Road Littleton, MA 01460 / US | [2001/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWEN, Leslie, J. 53 Hillcrest Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
NEAR, Craig, D. 178 Split Rock Drive Acton, MA 01718 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2001/07] | Quest, Barry, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98957563.4 | 04.11.1998 | [2001/07] | WO1998US23469 | Priority number, date | WO1998US08560 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: PCT/US98/08560 | US19980080746 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80746 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956500 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075776 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R17/00, H01L41/08 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
B06B1/0655 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H10N30/092 (EP,US);
H10N39/00 (EP,US);
H04R17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | NIEDERSPANNUNG PIEZOELEKTRISCHER TREIBER | [2001/07] | English: | LOW VOLTAGE PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR | [2001/07] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE BASSE TENSION | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4072871 (WILSON CHARLES R); | [X]EP0669169 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]US5173605 (HAYES JOHN B [US], et al); | [A]US5340510 (BOWEN LESLIE J [US]); | US5598050 [ ] (BOWEN LESLIE J [US], et al) |