EP1042256 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF DIFLUOROMETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERRI, Gustavo 3 Pine Tree Place Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 02 /
HUNT, Maurice, William 109 West Mantua Avenue Wenonah, NJ 08090 / US | 03 /
KEELER, David, W. 5 Wilkeshire Boulevard Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Frank, P. 77 Cherryville Station Road Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/41] | Sturm, Christoph Honeywell Holding AG, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98958082.4 | 18.11.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US24661 | Priority number, date | US19970972531 | 18.11.1997 Original published format: US 972531 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925670 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042256 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C19/08 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C07C17/383 (EP,US);
C07C17/20 (KR);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIFLUORMETHAN | [2000/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF DIFLUOROMETHANE | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DIFLUOROMETHANE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0805136 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 48 - line 51; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9711043 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 11 - line 13; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0767158 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 35; claim 7 *; | [A]US5495057 (NAM KYUNG H [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * |