EP1030597 - FLUID COLLECTION DEVICE WITH CAPTURED RECTRACTABLE NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MDC Investment Holdings, Inc. Delaware Trust Building, Suite 200, 900 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states MDC Investment Holdings, Inc. Delaware Trust Building, Suite 200, 900 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states MDC Investment Holdings, Inc. Delaware Trust Building, Suite 200 900 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTICH, Michael, J. 2330 Eagle Creek Lane Oxnard, CA 93030 / US | 02 /
HALSETH, Thor, R. 367 Buckboard Circle Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98958547.6 | 12.11.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998US24104 | Priority number, date | US19970065348 | 12.11.1997 Original published format: US 65348 | US19980081135 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: US 81135 | US19980084814 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: US 84814 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923947 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030597 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030597 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61M5/32 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61B5/150496 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/150656 (EP,US);
A61B5/150732 (EP,US);
A61B5/15074 (EP,US);
A61B5/150992 (EP,US);
A61B5/154 (EP,US);
A61M25/0631 (EP,US);
A61M25/0637 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | A61B5/14, A61M5/32 | ||
Former IPC [2000/35] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABNAHME VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN ODER GASEN MITTELS EINER ZURÜCKZIEHBAREN SICHERHEITSKANÜLE | [2000/35] | English: | FLUID COLLECTION DEVICE WITH CAPTURED RECTRACTABLE NEEDLE | [2000/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT DE FLUIDES AVEC AIGUILLE RETRACTABLE CAPTUREE | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Request for further processing for: | 27.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | CY | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | IE | 12.11.2007 | LU | 12.11.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/48] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4813426 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 59 * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]US4892107 (HABER TERRY M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5125414 (DYSARZ EDWARD D [US]) [A] 9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 42 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5178157 (FANLO RAMON G [US]) [A] 9 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5188599 (BOTICH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 13, line 12 - column 15, line 15; figures 10-12 *; | [X]US5423758 (SHAW THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 2 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US5531694 (CLEMENS ANTON H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 11 - line 41 * * column 9, line 1 - line 14 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 57 * * figures 7,10 *; | [A]EP0719564 (PHASE MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 2; figures 1-3,14,15 *; | [A]US5575777 (COVER WALTER E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 10 - line 20 ** figures 3,4,7 *; | [PX]US5810775 (SHAW THOMAS J [US]) [PX] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 31 * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US4947863 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al); | [Y]US5360408 (VAILLANCOURT VINCENT L [US]); | [Y]US5403286 (LOCKWOOD JR HANFORD N [US]); | [X]US5411487 (CASTAGNA JOHN F [US]) |