EP1032316 - CLIP INSERTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Aesculap AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIENZLE, Karl-Ernst Leitzenfelderstrasse 16 D-78194 Immendingen / DE | 02 /
MAYENBERGER, Rupert Steinerweg 33/6 D-78239 Rielasingen / DE | 03 /
WEISSHAUPT, Dieter Bachzimmerer Ösch 10 D-78194 Immendingen / DE | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Boehme, Ulrich, et al HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Böhme, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Patentanwälte GBR Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98958909.8 | 20.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998EP07478 | Priority number, date | DE1997152332 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19752332 | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926545 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032316 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032316 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, A61B17/28 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B17/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/36] | Title | German: | CLIPANLEGEGERÄT | [2000/36] | English: | CLIP INSERTING TOOL | [2000/36] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA POSE D'AGRAFES | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 30.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3335986 (AESCULAP WERKE AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4576165 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0621006 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 22, line 51 - column 24, line 30; figures 1-4,42-44 *; | [A]WO9523557 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 9 - page 16, line 38; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5643291 (PIER ARNOLD [DE], et al) [A] * figure 6 * |