EP1038409 - INTEGRATING COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOERESSEN, Olaf, J. Geibelstrasse 30 D-40235 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2000/39] | Higgin, Paul, et al Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue Southwood, Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98959077.3 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998IB02032 | Priority number, date | GB19970025659 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9725659 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929126 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038409 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038409 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2000/39] | Title | German: | INTEGRIEREN VON KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2000/39] | English: | INTEGRATING COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS | [2000/39] | French: | INTEGRATION DE RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08002918.4 / EP1924106 | EP08002919.2 / EP1924107 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0681406 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-4,10-13,21,24,25,27-29 * column A * * column 5, line 2 - line 12 * * column 9, line 2 - line 37 *; | [A]US5521925 (MERAKOS LAZAROS [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7,9-13,21,22,24,27,29 * column A * * column 5, line 3 - line 39 * * column 7, line 20 - line 56 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 11 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO9641491 (PACIFIC COMM SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - line 27 * * page 15, line 34 - page 16, line 12 * * page 22, line 22 - line 28 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0711088 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1,11-13,24,25,27-29 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 10 * * figure 4 * |