EP0965173 - A METHOD FOR ENCODING MULTIWORD INFORMATION BY WORDWISE INTERLEAVING AND ERROR PROTECTION, WITH ERROR LOCATIVE CLUES DERIVED FROM HIGH PROTECTIVITY WORDS AND DIRECTED TO LOW PROTECTIVITY WORDS, A METHOD FOR DECODING SUCH INFORMATION, A DEVICE FOR ENCODING AND/OR DECODING SUCH INFORMATION, AND A CARR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOLHUIZEN, Ludovicus, M., G., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN DIJK, Marten, E. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BAGGEN, Constant, P., M., J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98959092.2 | 21.12.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998IB02090 | Priority number, date | EP19970204130 | 29.12.1997 Original published format: EP 97204130 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934271 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965173 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
H03M13/2703 (EP);
G06F11/00 (KR);
G11B20/1833 (EP);
G11B20/1866 (EP);
H03M13/35 (EP);
H03M13/47 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [1999/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG VON MEHRWORTINFORMATION DURCH WORTWEISE VERSCHACHTELUNG UND FEHLERSCHUTZ WOBEI FEHLERPOSITIONSINDIZES VON HOCHGESCHÜTZEN WÖRTERN ABGELEITET UND NACH SCHWACH GESCHÜTZTEN WÖRTERN ZUGELEITET WIRD. VERFAHREN ZUR DEKODIERUNG DIESER INFORMATION, VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND/ODER DEKODIERUNG DIESER INFORMATION SOWIE DATENTRÄGER DAFÜR | [1999/51] | English: | A METHOD FOR ENCODING MULTIWORD INFORMATION BY WORDWISE INTERLEAVING AND ERROR PROTECTION, WITH ERROR LOCATIVE CLUES DERIVED FROM HIGH PROTECTIVITY WORDS AND DIRECTED TO LOW PROTECTIVITY WORDS, A METHOD FOR DECODING SUCH INFORMATION, A DEVICE FOR ENCODING AND/OR DECODING SUCH INFORMATION, AND A CARR | [1999/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE D'INFORMATION MULTIMOT PAR ENTRELACEMENT DE MOTS ET PROTECTION CONTRE LES ERREURS, LES INDICES DE LOCALISATION D'ERREUR ETANT DERIVES DE MOTS A GRANDE PROTECTION ET DIRIGES VERS DES MOTS A BASSE PROTECTION, PROCEDE DE DECODAGE DE LADITE INFORMATION, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET/OU DE DE | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/27] | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP59152749 ; | [A]US4559625 (BERLEKAMP ELWYN R [US], et al); | [A]EP0571019 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US5299208 (BLAUM MIGUEL M [US], et al); | [A]US5546420 (SESHADRI NAMBIRAJAN [US], et al); | [A]US5623504 (TOLHUIZEN LUDOVICUS M G M [NL]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 59152749 A (SONY K.K.) 31 August 1984., & JP59152749 A 19840831 |