EP1042083 - BENDING BLOCK FOR FOUR-HIGH ROLLING STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 35042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONINI, Estore Via Donizetti, 17 I-20059 Vimercate / IT | 02 /
DAL PAN, Giacinto Via Barco, 9 I-25060 Cellatica / IT | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Petraz, Gilberto, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 98959097.1 | 21.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998IB02097 | Priority number, date | IT1997UD00244 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: IT UD970244 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933586 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042083 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042083 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/20, B21B31/18, B21B29/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B21B31/185 (EP,US);
B21B29/00 (EP,US);
B21B31/203 (EP,US);
B21B13/023 (EP,US);
B21B2013/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | SI | 26.06.2000 | Title | German: | BIEGEBLOCK FÜR EIN QUARTOWALZGERÜST | [2000/41] | English: | BENDING BLOCK FOR FOUR-HIGH ROLLING STAND | [2000/41] | French: | BLOC DE PLIAGE POUR COLONNE DE CAGE DE LAMINOIR QUARTO | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.06.2002 | CH | 12.06.2002 | FI | 12.06.2002 | GR | 12.06.2002 | LI | 12.06.2002 | NL | 12.06.2002 | SE | 12.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | CH | 12.06.2002 | |
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 12.06.2002 | |
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
NL | 12.06.2002 | ||
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 12.06.2002 | |
SE | 12.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 12.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60118310 ; | [A]JPS5966906 ; | [DA]US4038857 (EIBE WERNER W, et al) [DA] 1* columns 2,3,6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0084927 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * page 4 - page 9; figure - *; | [DA]US4773246 (PERRET JEAN [FR]) [DA] 1 * column 3 - column 6; figure - *; | [A]EP0744228 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 5 - column 7; figure - *; | [A]EP0744227 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 5; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851030), vol. 009, no. 272, Database accession no. (M - 425), & JP60118310 A 19850625 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840810), vol. 008, no. 174, Database accession no. (M - 316), & JP59066906 A 19840416 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |