EP1042073 - SPRAY NOZZLE WITH DIRECTLY MOUNTED PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verbena Corporation N.V. Emancipatie Boulevard 31 Curacao / AN | [2003/46] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Verbena Corporation N.V. Ruyterkade 58 A Curacao, Antilles Néerlandaises / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICKART, Jean, René 19, Crêt de Choully CH-1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
MEYER, Pascal 4, rue des Mariniers F-75014 Paris / FR | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Poncet, Jean-François, et al Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Poncet, Jean-François, et al Cabinet Poncet, 7, chemin de Tillier, B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98959102.9 | 22.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998IB02104 | Priority number, date | FR19970016749 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9716749 | [2000/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933573 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042073 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042073 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/34, B05B15/02 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B05B1/3436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/41] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBUNSDÜSE MIT AUFGESETZTEM PLÄTTCHEN | [2000/41] | English: | SPRAY NOZZLE WITH DIRECTLY MOUNTED PLATE | [2000/41] | French: | BUSE DE PULVERISATION A PLAQUETTE RAPPORTEE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 17.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2003 | GB | 08.10.2003 | IT | 08.10.2003 | DK | 08.01.2004 | DE | 09.01.2004 | ES | 19.01.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
GB | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
DE | 09.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
GB | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
DE | 09.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
DE | 09.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 08.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH421009 (ESB VOEHRINGER [DE]) [A] 1,5* the whole document * | by applicant | CH421009 |