EP1051482 - CYTOTOXIC HETEROMERIC PROTEIN COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Health Network 610 University Avenue Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9 / CA | [2006/34] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states University Health Network 610 University Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5G 2M9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states The Ontario Cancer Institute Princess Margaret Hospital, 610 University Avenue Toronto Ontario MG5 2M9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARIEPY, Jean, Ontario Cancer Inst. Princess Margaret Hosp., 610 University Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5G 2M9 / CA | 02 /
BRAY, Mark, Robert, Ontario Cancer Inst. Princess Margaret Hosp., 610 University Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5G 2M9 2M9 / CA | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Barth, Renate Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Barth, Renate, Dr. Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98959689.5 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/46] | WO1998CA01137 | Priority number, date | CA19982222993 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: CA 2222993 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940185 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051482 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051482 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C07K14/25, C12Q1/68, A61K31/70, A61K39/02, G01N33/68 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C07K14/25 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/1055 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | KOMBINATORISCHE BIBLIOTHEKEN HETEROMERER CYTOTOXISCHER PROTEINE | [2000/46] | English: | CYTOTOXIC HETEROMERIC PROTEIN COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES | [2000/46] | French: | BANQUES COMBINATOIRES DE PROTEINES HETEROMERES CYTOTOXIQUES | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | IE | 08.12.2006 | LU | 08.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
LU | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - T. IIDA ET AL., "A single amino acid substitution of Escherichia coli enterotoxin affects its oligomer formation", J. BIOL. CHEM., AM. SOC. BIOCHEM. MOL.BIOL.,INC.,BALTIMORE,US, (19890825), vol. 265, no. 24, pages 14065 - 14070, XP002096323 [X] 1,3,5,8,9,16,17 * see Materials and Methods; page 14068, column R, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1,6 | [DX] - C. CLARK ET AL., "Phenylalanine 30 plays an important role in receptor binding of verotoxin-1", MOLECULAR MICROBIOL., BLACKWELL, OXFORD, GB, (199602), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 891 - 899, XP002096376 [DX] 1,3,5,8,9,16,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2958.1996.427962.x | [DXY] - G.J. TYRELL ET AL., "Alteration of the carbohydrate binding specificity of verotoxins from Gal(alpha)1-4Gal to GalNAc(beta)1-3Gal(alpha)1-4Gal and vice versa by site-directed mutagenesis of the binding subunit", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., NATL. ACAD. SCI.,WASHINGTON,DC,US;, (199201), vol. 89, pages 524 - 528, XP002096324 [DX] 17,18,21 * the whole document * [Y] 1,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.2.524 | [DXY] - L.P. PERERA ET AL., "Identification of three amino acids residues in the B subunit of Shiga toxin and Shiga-like toxin type II that are essential for holotoxin activity", J. BACTERIOL., AM. SOC. MICROBIOL.,BALTIMORE,US;, (199102), vol. 173, no. 3, pages 1151 - 1160, XP002096325 [DX] 1-3,5,8-10,16-18,21 * the whole document * [Y] 1,6 | [XY] - D.J. BAST ET AL., "Toxicity and immunogenecity of a verotoxin 1 mutant with reduced globotriaosylceramide receptor binding in rabbits", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, ASM,WASHINGTON,DC,US, (199706), vol. 65, no. 6, pages 2019 - 2028, XP002096326 [X] 17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 1,6 | [X] - S.W. LINDGREN ET AL., "The specific activities of Shiga-like toxin type II (SLT-II) and SLT-II related toxin of enterohemorrhagic Escherichia coli differ when measured by vero cell cytotoxicity but not by mouse lethality", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, ASM,WASHINGTON,DC,US, (199402), vol. 62, no. 2, pages 623 - 631, XP002096327 [X] 1-3,5,8-10,16-18,21 * the whole document * | [X] - M.P. JACKSON ET AL., "Functional analysis of the Shiga toxin and Shiga-like toxin type II variant binding site subunits by using site-directed mutagenesis", J. BACTERIOL., AM. SOC. MICROBIOL.,BALTIMORE,US;, (199002), vol. 172, no. 2, pages 653 - 658, XP002096328 [X] 1-3,5,8-10,16-18,21 * the whole document * | [DY] - J.D. MERMES ET AL., "A reliable method for random mutagenesis: the generation of mutant libraries using spiked oligonucleotide primers", GENE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS,B.V.,AMSTERDAM,NL;, (1989), vol. 84, pages 143 - 151, XP002096329 [DY] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(89)90148-0 | [DY] - G. DEL RÍO ET AL., "Combinatorial libraries of proteins: Analysis of efficiency of mutagenesis techniques", BIOTECHNIQUES, NATICK, MA, US, (1994), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 1132 - 1139, XP002096330 [DY] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - A.A. KHINE AND C.A. LINGWOOD, "Capping and receptor-mediated endocytosis of cell-bound verotoxin (Shiga-like toxin) 1: Chemical identification of an amino acid in the B subunit necessary for efficient receptor glycolipid binding and cellular internalization", J. CELL PHYSIOL., Wiley-Liss, Inc.,new york, US, (199411), vol. 161, no. 2, pages 319 - 332, XP002096331 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.1041610217 | [DA] - P.-G. NYHOLM ET AL., "Two distinct binding sites for globotriaosyl ceramide on verotoxins: identification by molecular modelling and confirmation using deoxy analogues and a new glycolipid receptor for all verotoxins", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, Current Biology LTD, ISSN 1074-5521, (199604), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 263 - 275, XP002096332 [DA] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(96)90106-4 | [DA] - P.G. NYHOLM ET AL., "Modelling of the interaction of verotoxin-1 (VT1) with its glycolipid receptor. globotriaosylceramide (Gb3)", INT. J. BIOL. MACROMOL., Elsevier Science B.V., Amsterdam, NL, (199506), vol. 17, no. 3-4, pages 199 - 204, XP002096333 [DA] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-8130(95)92686-K | [DA] - P.E. STEIN ET AL., "Crystal structure of the cell-binding B oligomer of verotoxin-1 from E.coli", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., LONDON,UK, (19920220), vol. 355, pages 748 - 750, XP002096334 [DA] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/355748a0 | [PX] - BRAY, M. R. ET AL, "Shiga-like toxin as a template for the development of anti-breast cancer agents.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (MARCH, 1998) VOL. 39, PP. 62-63. MEETING INFO.: 89TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA MARCH 28-APRIL 1, 1998 AMERIC, XP002096335 [PX] 1-17 * Abstract no. 428; * | [PX] - BRAY, M. R. ET AL, "Expression of the Shiga-like toxin I receptor CD77 on human breast carcinomas, follicular lymphomas and multiple myelomas and absence of expression on CD34+ human hematopoietic cells: Implications for tumor cell purging.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (MARCH, 1998) VOL. 39, PP. 63. MEETING INFO.: 89TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA MARCH 28-APRIL 1, 1998 AMERICAN, XP002096336 [PX] 18,21 * Abstract no. 429; * | [PA] - H. LING ET AL., "Structure of the Shiga-like toxin I B-pentamer complexed with an analogue of its receptor Gb3", BIOCHEMISTRY, AM. CHEM. SOC.,WASHINGTON,DC,US, (19980217), vol. 37, pages 1777 - 1788, XP002096337 [PA] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi971806n |