EP1027593 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT FLUORESCENCE IMMUNOASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR CHEMO- UND BIOSENSORIK Münster e.V. Mendelstrasse 7 48149 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states INSTITUT FUR CHEMO- UND BIOSENSORIK Münster E.V. Mendelstrasse 7 48149 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATERKAMP, Andreas Wilhelmstrasse 65 D-48149 Münster / DE | 02 /
KUNZ, Ulrich Schwanenstrasse 18 D-88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
GRAWE, Frank Kinderhauser Strasse 171 D-48147 Münster / DE | 04 /
KEY, Göran Jeggener Weg 160 D-49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98959766.1 | 27.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998DE03154 | Priority number, date | DE1997147572 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747572 | [2000/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922222 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027593 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7709 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON FLUORESZENZIMMUNTESTS | [2000/33] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT FLUORESCENCE IMMUNOASSAYS | [2000/33] | French: | METHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE FLUOROMETRIQUE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2002 | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4909990 (BLOCK MYRON J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8,20 * column 5, line 35 - column 9, line 28; figure 4 *; | [XAY]US5492674 (MESEROL PETER [US]) [X] 1,3,11,13 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 12; figures 2-4,8-10 * [A] 10,14 [Y] 12,15,16,19; | [DY]WO9710506 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [DY] 12,15,16,19 * page 17, line 19 - page 19, line 16; figure 1 * |