EP1036175 - HUMAN BRAIN DERIVED KCNQ2 POTASSIUM CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aiyar, Jayashree 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 02 /
Iannotti, Claudia Ann 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 03 /
Christian, Edward Philip 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 04 /
Logsdon, Naomi Jean 5573 13th Avenue, South Birmingham 35222 Alabama / US | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
Aiyar, Jayashree 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | ||
02 /
Iannotti, Claudia Ann 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
03 /
Christian, Edward Philip 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
04 /
Logsdon, Naomi Jean 1800 Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | Representative(s) | Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair, et al Astra Zeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park, Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair, et al Astra Zeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960004.4 | 11.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998GB03720 | Priority number, date | GB19970026339 | 13.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726339 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931232 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036175 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036175 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, A61K38/17, G01N33/566 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | AUS DEM MENSCHLICHEN GEHIRN STAMMENDER KCNQ2 KALIUMKANAL | [2007/49] | English: | HUMAN BRAIN DERIVED KCNQ2 POTASSIUM CHANNEL | [2000/38] | French: | CANAL POTASSIQUE KCNQ2 EXTRAIT DU CERVEAU HUMAIN | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/38] | MENSCHLICHER GEHIRNSTAMMENDER KCNQ2 KALIUMKANAL | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Request for further processing for: | 26.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2005 | Decision despatched | 05.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | IE | 11.12.2008 | LU | 11.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
IE | 11.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
IE | 11.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH09191882 ; | [Y]WO9723598 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 4,10-13,26,27 * claims 3-6,22,23 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, & JP09191882 A 19970729 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [X] 1,3,5,29 * abstract * [Y] 2,4,6-13,26-28 | [XY] - EMPATENT DATABASE Accession number E13516 Yokoyama M. ET AL. 23-JUN-1998 (Rel. 56, Created) Human mRNA for a K+ channel protein, XP002095811 [X] 1,3,5,29 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,6-13,26-28 | [DX] - YOKOYAMA M ET AL, "Identification and cloning of neuroblastoma-specific and nerve tissue-specific genes through compiled expression profiles.", DNA RES, OCT 31 1996, 3 (5) P311-20, JAPAN, XP002095807 [DX] 1,3,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/3.5.311 | [X] - EMHUM1 DATABASE Accession number D82346 Yokoyama M. ET AL. 15-FEB-1997 (Rel. 50, Created) Homo sapiens mRNA for HNSPC, XP002095812 [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * | [Y] - WEI A ET AL, "Eight potassium channel families revealed by the C. elegans genome project.", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, 1996, 35 (7) P805-29, ENGLAND, XP002095808 [Y] 2,4,6-13,26-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(96)00126-8 | [PX] - BIERVERT C ET AL, "A potassium channel mutation in neonatal human epilepsy.", SCIENCE, JAN 16 1998, 279 (5349) P403-6, UNITED STATES, XP002095809 [PX] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5349.403 | [DPX] - SINGH NA ET AL, "A novel potassium channel gene, KCNQ2, is mutated in an inherited epilepsy of newborns [see comments]", NAT GENET, JAN 1998, 18 (1) P25-9, UNITED STATES, XP002095810 [DPX] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0198-25 |