EP1147370 - SELF GATING PHOTOSURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3DV Systems Ltd. P.O. Box 249 Yokneam Elit 20692 / IL | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Ori, J. Boyer Street 12/7 69127 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
IDDAN, Gavriel, J. Einstein Street 44A 34602 Haifa / IL | 03 /
YAHAV, Giora Beiliss Street 11 34814 Haifa / IL | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/43] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98960068.9 | 16.12.1998 | [2001/43] | WO1998IL00611 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036372 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147370 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147370 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01C3/08 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G01C3/22 (EP,US);
G01C3/08 (EP,US);
G01S17/48 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4863 (EP,US);
G02B7/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/43] | Title | German: | SELBSTTASTENDE PHOTOEMPFINDLICHE OBERFLÄCHE | [2001/43] | English: | SELF GATING PHOTOSURFACE | [2001/43] | French: | SURFACE PHOTOSENSIBLE A DEBLOCAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08169123.0 / EP2026035 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/06] | NL | 25.02.2009 | |
ES | 05.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4979816 (WHITE STEVEN J [US]); | [A]US5430290 (MERLE JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al); | [Y]US5682229 (WANGLER RICHARD J [US]) |