EP1034255 - LINEAGE RESTRICTED GLIAL PRECURSORS FROM THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 210 Park Building Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF UTAH RESEARCH FOUNDATION 210 Park Building Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Mahendra, S. 4590 S. Parkhill Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84124 / US | 02 /
NOBLE, Mark 1270 E. Siesta Drive Sandy, UT 84093 / US | 03 /
MAYER-PROSCHEL, Margot 12169 S. Hidden Valley Road Sandy, UT 84092 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/37] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960230.5 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US24456 | Priority number, date | US19970980850 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: US 980850 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928443 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034255 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/5058 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C12N5/0622 (EP,US);
C12N5/0623 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
C12N2501/135 (EP,US);
C12N2501/395 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | AUF EINE ZELLINIE BESCHRÄNKTE GLIALE VORLÄUFERZELLEN AUS DEM ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEM | [2000/37] | English: | LINEAGE RESTRICTED GLIAL PRECURSORS FROM THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | [2000/37] | French: | PRECURSEURS GLIAUX A LIGNAGE RESTREINT TIRES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 29.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2007 | 17.08.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.09.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 21.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10] | 25.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 29.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - RAO M S ET AL, "GLIAL-RESTRICTED PRECURSORS ARE DERIVED FROM MULTIPOTENT NEUROEPITHELIAL STEM CELLS", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199708), vol. 188, ISSN 0012-1606, pages 48 - 63, XP000916227 [X] 1-17,19-21 * see p. 48-9, figure 10 * [Y] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1997.8597 | [X] - KILPATRICK T J ET AL, "CLONED MULTIPOTENTIAL PRECURSOR FROM THE MOUSE CEREBRUM REQUIRE FGF-2, WHEREAS GLIAL RESTRICTED PRECURSORS ARE STIMULATED WITH EITHER FGF-2 OR EGF", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 3653 - 3661, XP000916277 [X] 1-17,19-21 * see abstract, p. 3657-60 * | [Y] - NAKAFUKU M ET AL, "ESTABLISHMENT AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A MULTIPOTENTIAL NEURAL CELL LINE THAT CAN CONDITIONALLY GENERATE NEURONS, ASTROCYTES, AND OLIGODENDROCYTES IN VITRO", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, WILEY-LISS, US, (19950601), vol. 2, no. 41, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 153 - 168, XP001069706 [Y] 1-23 * see p. 155-6, 160-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.490410203 | [Y] - TEMPLE S ET AL, "DIFFERENTIATION OF A BIPOTENTIAL GLIAL PROGENITOR CELL IN SINGLE CELL MICROCULTURE", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (1985), vol. 313, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 223 - 225, XP000919125 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/313223a0 | [Y] - LIN Q ET AL, "Human fetal astrocytes as an ex vivo gene therapy vehicle for delivering biologically active nerve growth factor", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, XX, XX, (19970210), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 331 - 339, XP000864703 [Y] 18,22,23 * see p. 335-337 * | International search | [X]US5411883 (BOSS BARBARA D [US], et al); | [X]US5688692 (JAT PARMJIT SINGH [GB], et al) | [X] - GARD A L, WILLIAMS W C, BURRELL M R, "OLIGODENDROBLASTS DISTINGUISHED FROM O-2A GLIAL PROGENITORS BY SURFACE PHENOTYPE (O4+GALC-) AND RESPONSE TO CYTOKINES USING SIGNALTRANSDUCER LIFRBETA", Developmental Biology, Academic Press, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950101), vol. 167, doi:10.1006/dbio.1995.1051, ISSN 0012-1606, pages 569 - 608, XP002917553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1995.1051 | [X] - BAILEY K A, DRAGO J, BARTLETT P F, "NEURONAL PROGENITORS IDENTIFIED BY THEIR INABILITY TO EXPRESS CLASSI HISTOCOMPATIBILITY ANTIGENS IN RESPONSE TO INTERFERON-GAMMA", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH., WILEY-LISS., US, US, (19941001), vol. 39, no. 02, doi:10.1002/jnr.490390207, ISSN 0360-4012, page 166/167, XP002917554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.490390207 |