EP1033036 - ADAPTIVE ENTROPY CODING IN ADAPTIVE QUANTIZATION FRAMEWORK FOR VIDEO SIGNAL CODING SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2001/36] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, CA 92660-3095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIST, Anurag 3800 Parkview Lane 13D Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960467.3 | 25.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US25155 | Priority number, date | US19970980654 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: US 980654 | US19980198742 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: US 198742 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929115 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033036 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033036 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE ENTROPIE-KODIERUNG IM RAHMEN ADAPTIVER QUANTISIERUNG FÜR VIDEOSIGNALKODIERSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2000/36] | English: | ADAPTIVE ENTROPY CODING IN ADAPTIVE QUANTIZATION FRAMEWORK FOR VIDEO SIGNAL CODING SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES | [2000/36] | French: | CODAGE ENTROPIQUE ADAPTATIF DANS UN CADRE DE QUANTIFICATION ADAPTATIVE POUR SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CODAGE DE SIGNAL VIDEO | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.02.2003 | GR | 12.02.2003 | IT | 12.02.2003 | NL | 12.02.2003 | DK | 12.05.2003 | PT | 12.05.2003 | SE | 12.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | FI | 12.02.2003 | |
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 12.02.2003 | |
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 12.02.2003 | |
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 12.02.2003 | |
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 12.02.2003 | |
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 12.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0575113 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 35,46 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 53 * * column 8, line 34 - line 53 * * column 12, line 57 - column 13, line 22 * * column 15, line 5 - line 48 * * figures 1,9 * [Y] 36-43,47-49; | [A]EP0574746 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 13-34 * page 10, line 11 - line 57 ** figure 3C *; | [XAY]WO9634496 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 13,24,35,40,46,50,57 [Y] 14; | [PXY]EP0859520 (ROCKWELL SEMICONDUCTOR SYS INC [US]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * [PY] 22,23,33,34; | [XAY] - SIU-WAI WU ET AL, "RATE-CONSTRAINED OPTIMAL BLOCK-ADAPTIVE CODING FOR DIGITAL TAPE RECORDING OF HDTV", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (19910301), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 100 - 112, 160 - 161 - 162, XP000208644 [X] 1,2,6,13,15-21,24-32 * see sections II, III and V.D * * abstract * [A] 35,46,50,57 [Y] 14,22,23,33,34,36-43,47-49 | [X] - SCHUSTER G M ET AL, "Optimal decomposition for quad-trees with leaf dependencies", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING '97, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, 12-14 FEB. 1997, ISSN 0277-786X, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1997, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 3024, pt.1, pages 59 - 70, XP002098297 [X] 50-63 * see first paragraph of section 1 * * see sections 2, 4 and 5 * * see first paragraph of section 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.263281 | [A] - BIST A ET AL, "CONSTRAINED TRELLIS BASED RATE CONTROL SCHEME FOR LOW BIT RATE VIDEO CODING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (IC, LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960916), vol. 2, pages 61 - 64, XP002067812 [A] 1-63 * see section 3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560601 | [A] - ORTEGA A ET AL, "OPTIMAL BUFFER-CONSTRAINED SOURCE QUANTIZATION AND FAST APPROXIMATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, SAN DIEGO, MAY 10 - 13, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (1992), vol. 1, no. CONF. 25, pages 192 - 195, XP000606116 [A] 1-63 * see sections 2 and 3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1992.229981 | [A] - COENE W ET AL, "A FAST ROUTE FOR APPLICATION OF RATE-DISTORTION OPTIMAL QUANTIZATION IN AN MPEG VIDEO ENCODER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (IC, LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960916), vol. 2, pages 825 - 828, XP000733350 [A] 1-63 * see section 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.561032 | [A] - SCHUSTER G M ET AL, "FAST AND EFFICIENT MODE AND QUANTIZER SELECTION IN THE RATE DISTORTION SENSE FOR H.263", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19960317), vol. 2727, no. PART 02, pages 784 - 795, XP000617893 [A] 1-63 * see sections 2, 3, 5 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.233293 | [A] - CROUSE M ET AL, "JOINT THRESHOLDING AND QUANTIZER SELECTION FOR DECODER-COMPATIBLE BASELINE JPEG", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995 IMAGE AND MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING/ SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS DEVELOPMENT, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950509), vol. 4, no. CONF. 20, pages 2331 - 2334, XP000535417 [A] 1-63 * the whole document * |