EP1034340 - System for transferring loads between cast-in-place slabs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/37] | SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING LOADS BETWEEN CAST-IN-PLACE SLABS | ||
[2005/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boxall, Russell 3011 Windsor Chase Drive Matthews, NC 28105 / US | For all designated states Parkes, Nigel K. 3473 Palace Court Tucker, NC 30084 / US | [2001/03] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Permaban North America Inc. P.O. Box 1411 Matthews, NC 28106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOXALL, Russell 3011 Windsor Chase Drive Matthews, NC 28105 / US | 02 /
PARKES, Nigel, K. 3473 Palace Court Tucker, NC 30084 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Piésold, Alexander J. Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960468.1 | 25.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US25157 | Priority number, date | US19970066963P | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 66963 P | US19980195320 | 18.11.1998 Original published format: US 195320 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931329 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034340 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034340 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/48, E04B1/16, E01C11/14 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
E01C11/14 (EP,US);
E04B1/483 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | E04B1/16, E04B1/48 | Designated contracting states | GB [2000/37] | Title | German: | System zum Übertragen von Lasten zwischen Ortbetonplatten | [2005/18] | English: | System for transferring loads between cast-in-place slabs | [2005/18] | French: | Système de transfert des charges pour dalles coulées sur place | [2005/18] |
Former [2000/37] | LASTTRANSPORTSYSTEM FÜR ORTBETONPLATTEN | ||
Former [2000/37] | SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING LOADS BETWEEN CAST-IN-PLACE SLABS | ||
Former [2000/37] | SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT DE CHARGES ENTRE DES DALLES COULEES SUR PLACE | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT348222B (HOFINGER RUDOLF G [AT]) [X] 1-4 * figures 3,4 * * page 2, lines 2-4 *; | [A]EP0328484 (EGCO AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3559541 (WATSTEIN DAVID) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 2, lines 55-69 *; | [A]DE3310281 (WERTHEBACH GUENTER) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US2103337 (FOSTER OURY JOHN) | by applicant | US5005331 | US5216862 | US5487249 | US4733513 |