EP1036169 - NUCLEIC ACID MEDIATED RNA TAGGING AND RNA REVISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083 Durham North Carolina 27708-0083 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY 230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083 Durham, North Carolina 27708-0083 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLENGER, Bruce, A. 11 Street St. Andrews Court Durham, NC 27710 / US | 02 /
LAN, Ning No. 6-F 618 South LaSalle Street Durham, NC 27705 / US | 03 /
LEE, Seong-Wook Apartment 4-801 Chungryangri-dong 235-11 Dongdaemoon-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
MILICH, Lynn 1305C Rosedale Avenue Durham, NC 27707 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960693.4 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US25652 | Priority number, date | US19970067834P | 05.12.1997 Original published format: US 67834 P | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929842 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036169 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/12, C12N9/00, C07K14/805, A61K48/00, C12Q1/68 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/124 (EP,US);
C12N2310/1241 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄURE-BEMITTELTE RNA-MARKIERUNG UND ÜBERPRÜFUNG | [2000/38] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID MEDIATED RNA TAGGING AND RNA REVISION | [2000/38] | French: | MARQUAGE D'ARN PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET REPARATION D'ARN | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9513379 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US]) [DX] 1,5-7,10,11 * page 10, line 32 - page 14 * * page 20, line 27 - page 22, line 6 * * claim - * * figures 1C,7 *; | [X] - SULLENGER, B., "Gene therapy's next wave: messenger RNA repair", THE JOURNAL OF NIH RESEARCH, (199701), vol. 9, pages 37 - 40, XP002101535 [X] 1,5-7 * the whole document * | [XA] - LAN, N. ET AL, "Trans - splicing ribozymes can be targeted to react with specific sequences of intra-cellular beta- globin mRNA.", BLOOD, VOL. 90 (NO. 10 SUPPL. 1 PART 1), PP. 443A; ABSTRACT 1966, (19971115), XP002101536 [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * [A] 3,4,8,9,14,15 | [ ] - 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA DECEMBER 5-9, 1997 THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY | [X] - JONES J T ET AL, "TAGGING RIBOZYME REACTION SITES TO FOLLOW TRANS-SPLICING IN MAMMALIAN CELLS", NATURE MEDICINE, (199606), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 643 - 648, XP000652816 [X] 1,4-6,8,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0696-643 | [A] - KOLLIAS, G. ET AL., "Regulated expression of human Agamma-, beta-, and hybrid gamma/beta-globin genes in transgenic mice: manipulation of the developmental expression patterns", CELL, (19860704), vol. 46, pages 89 - 94, XP002101537 [A] 2 * page 91, column R, paragraph L - page 92, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(86)90862-7 | [DA] - BARTEL D P ET AL, "ISOLATION OF NEW RIBOZYMES FROM A LARGE POOL OF RANDOM SEQUENCES", SCIENCE, (19930910), vol. 261, pages 1411 - 1418, XP002912511 [DA] 3,4,8,9,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7690155 | [A] - LLOYD J A ET AL, "HUMAN GAMMA- TO BETA-GLOBIN GENE SWITCHING USING A MINI CONSTRUCT IN TRANSGENIC MICE", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (19920401), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 1561 - 1567, XP000590833 [A] 2 | [DA] - SULLENGER B A ET AL, "RIBOZYME-MEDIATED REPAIR OF DEFECTIVE MRNA BY TARGETED TRANS-SPLICING", NATURE, (19941013), vol. 371, pages 619 - 622, XP002033257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/371619a0 | [A] - MIKHEEVA, S. & JARRELL, K., "Use of engineered ribozymes to catalyze chimeric gene assembly", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., (199607), vol. 93, pages 7486 - 7490, XP002101538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.15.7486 | [PX] - LAN N ET AL, "Ribozyme -mediated repair of sickle beta- globin mRNAs in erythrocyte precursors.", SCIENCE, (1998 JUN 5) 280 (5369) 1593-6., XP002101539 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.280.5369.1593 |